House | 05/25/2023 | Veto override message received | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Measure sent to House | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Vetoed 05/05/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Floyd |