Senate | 04/26/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Alvord |