Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2023