Senate | 04/23/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Remove as author Senator Howard; authored by Senator Gollihare | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard |