Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB772 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2023