Senate | 05/25/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading rescinded | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman |