Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB796 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 27, 2023