Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB804 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023