Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB835 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023