House | 05/29/2024 | Veto override message received | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Measure sent to House | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Veto overridden: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Vetoed 05/05/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Cornwell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Stephens |