Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Amended

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2023