House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Seifried, Pemberton, Murdock, Bergstrom, Rogers, Burns, Thompson (Roger), Stewart, Bullard, Weaver, Stanley, Newhouse, Prieto, Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Jett
|
|
|