Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB93 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023