Senate | 05/05/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Archer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Jech |