Senate | 06/06/2023 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2023 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | HAs read | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Kidd |