Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB978 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023