Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SJR16 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024