Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Reported Do Pass as amended Technology and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Technology and Telecommunications | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Authored by Senator Sacchieri (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Government Oversight committee; Do Pass General Government | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader |