Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Frix | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Health and Human Services Oversight committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Oversight | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Sterling |