Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Ranson | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCane | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Authored by Senator Guthrie (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Government Oversight committee; Do Pass General Government | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Lay |