Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Amended | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass Criminal Judiciary | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Referred to Criminal Judiciary | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Representative Harris |