House
|
05/01/2025
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
CR; Do Pass Health and Human Services Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Health and Human Services Oversight committee; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Marti
|
|
|