House
|
04/29/2025
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Health and Human Services Oversight committee; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Referred to Health and Human Services Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Representative Townley
|
|
|