Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2897 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Amended

Bill April 21, 2025
Bill March 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill March 5, 2025