House | 04/16/2025 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Stinson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Gollihare |