House | 04/16/2025 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Oversight Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Energy and Natural Resources Oversight committee; Do Pass Agriculture | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Agriculture | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources Oversight | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Murdock |