Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett, Dollens, Waldron, Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Hefner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Archer (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Revenue and Taxation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Revenue and Taxation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Senator Dossett
|
|
|