Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB50 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2025
Bill March 17, 2025

Amended

Bill April 21, 2025
Bill February 27, 2025