Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2025

Amended

Bill April 21, 2025
Bill February 13, 2025