Senate | 02/20/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Deevers | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | First Reading |