Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Manger
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass Criminal Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative George (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|