Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|