Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB85 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025
Bill March 18, 2025

Amended

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill February 24, 2025