Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2025

Amended

Bill April 22, 2025
Bill February 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2025