Senate | 03/10/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Alvord | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | First Reading |