Senate | 04/29/2025 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | General Order | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Oversight Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Policy recommendation to the Energy and Natural Resources Oversight committee; Do Pass Agriculture | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Agriculture | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources Oversight | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Authored by Senator Jech |