Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Amended

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill February 19, 2025