Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 24
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Osburn
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, West (Kevin), Hefner, Hill
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Policy recommendation to the Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight committee; Do Pass Civil Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Referred to Civil Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Oversight
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Remove as coauthor Senator McIntosh
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Emergency failed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Frix
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator McIntosh
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Gise (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Authored by Senator Thompson
|
|
|