Oklahoma 2025 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB991 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 26, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2025

Amended

Bill April 21, 2025
Bill February 20, 2025