Senate | 05/01/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Anderson, Meek, Thatcher. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Carried over to 05-01 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Third reading. Carried by McIntire. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Cate, Evans, Nguyen H, Ruiz. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |