Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Drazan. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Cate, Nguyen H. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-21 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |