House
|
04/24/2025
|
Filed with Secretary of State.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Made Special Order of Business. Final reading. Carried by Bonham. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Jama.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Carried over to 04-21 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Carried over to 04-16 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Carried over to 04-15 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Carried over to 04-14 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Carried over to 04-09 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Carried over to 04-08 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Carried over to 04-07 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Carried over to 04-02 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Recommendation: Do adopt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred to Rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Read. Carried by McIntire. Adopted. Ayes, 53; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused, 5--Breese-Iverson, Edwards, Levy E, Nguyen H, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Owens.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Recommendation: Be adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Public Hearing and Work Session held.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|