House | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Special Order of Business. Final reading. Carried by Smith DB. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Hayden, Thatcher. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Taken from 03-10 Calendar and placed on 03-20 Calendar as a Special Order of Business on voice vote. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Recommendation: Do adopt. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |