Senate | 05/14/2025 | Filed With Secretary of State. | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Speaker signed. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | President signed. | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Lively. Adopted. Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Breese-Iverson, Edwards, Evans, Nguyen H, Osborne, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Fahey. | ||
House | 05/12/2025 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business immediately. | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Final reading. Carried by Prozanski. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Linthicum, Taylor. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Recommendation: Do adopt. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |