Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (03/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (03/08/2023) | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2023) | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |