Senate | 06/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2023) | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2023) | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |