House | 06/12/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/04/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2023) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |