Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/18/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2023) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2023) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |