Senate | 06/08/2023 | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2023) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |