House | 05/11/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/11/2023) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |